Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 159 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17962 Week
» 70978 Month
» 190505 Year
» 3217358 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4375 |
m/e |
11/1927 |
British Railways |
44375 |
w/e |
24/09/1949 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1960 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1927 |
11A |
|
Carnforth |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
5D |
|
Stoke |
w/e |
17/01/1948 |
9G |
|
Gorton |
4w/e |
17/05/1958 |
9D |
|
Buxton (LNWR) |
w/e |
22/08/1959 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
15/10/1960 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
5D |
Stoke |
w/e |
17/01/1948 |
ALLOC |
9G |
Gorton |
4w/e |
17/05/1958 |
ALLOC |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
8w/e |
05/09/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
15/10/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1927 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4375 Built at Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Carnforth (11A) |
|
|
17/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
24/09/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44375 |
|
|
17/05/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (9G) |
|
|
22/08/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9D) |
|
|
10/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
15/10/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44375 |
|
|