Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 199 Today
» 1257 Yesterday
» 5316 Week
» 25758 Month
» 362604 Year
» 1584169 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 2529 m/e 11/1894
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 8954 m/e 09/1927
British Railways 48954 m/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class A Compound
Company History LNWR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
A11/1894
C03/1905
G101/1925
G2A12/1940
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 3549
To Service During 11/1894
Withdrawal 4w/e Sat 16/07/1949 off Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (10E)
Service Life 54 yrs, 8 mths , 15 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1894
10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn 4w/e 16/07/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 2A Rugby w/e 16/08/1947
ALLOC 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) w/e 30/08/1947
WDN   w/e 25/06/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1894 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2529
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3549
   
09/1927 Renumbered Renumbered to 8954    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (10E)    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 48954 but not taken up    
16/07/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 8954 from Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (10E)    

prev prev