Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 1241 Today
» 1315 Yesterday
» 1241 Week
» 30739 Month
» 367585 Year
» 1589150 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 1808 m/e 10/1897
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9047 m/e 02/1928
British Railways 49047 m/e 11/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class A Compound
Company History LNWR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
A10/1897
D05/1908
G2A07/1929
G106/1933
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 3813
To Service During 10/1897
Withdrawal w/e Sat 04/01/1958
Service Life 60 yrs, 3 mths , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1897
6B Mold Junction on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn w/e 04/01/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 5B Crewe South w/e 02/10/1948
ALLOC 5C Stafford w/e 16/10/1948
WDN   w/e 04/01/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1897 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1808
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3813
   
02/1928 Renumbered Renumbered to 9047    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Mold Junction (6B)    
11/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 49047    
04/01/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 49047    

prev prev