Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 130 Today
» 1257 Yesterday
» 5247 Week
» 25689 Month
» 362535 Year
» 1584100 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 1815 m/e 11/1897
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9044 m/e 01/1927
British Railways 49044 m/e 03/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class A Compound
Company History LNWR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
A11/1897
D04/1908
G101/1927
G2A10/1939
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 3820
To Service During 11/1897
Withdrawal w/e Sat 24/10/1959
Service Life 61 yrs, 11 mths , 23 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1897
3A Bescot on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn w/e 24/10/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 3A Bescot w/e 21/06/1947
ALLOC 3B Bushbury w/e 26/03/1949
WDN   w/e 24/10/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1897 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1815
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3820
   
01/1927 Renumbered Renumbered to 9044    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bescot (3A)    
03/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 49044    
24/10/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 49044    

prev prev