Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 723 Today
» 1249 Yesterday
» 1972 Week
» 22414 Month
» 359260 Year
» 1580825 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 1816 m/e 11/1897
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9045 m/e 11/1927
British Railways 49045 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class A Compound
Company History LNWR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
A11/1897
D04/1908
G110/1930
G2A05/1939
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 3821
To Service During 11/1897
Withdrawal w/e Sat 22/12/1962
Service Life 65 yrs, 1 mth , 21 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1897
3A Bescot on 01/01/1948
3D Aston 4w/e 23/03/1957
3A Bescot w/e 29/11/1958
2B Nuneaton w/e 24/02/1962
21B Bescot w/e 05/05/1962
   Withdrawn w/e 22/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 3D Aston 4w/e 23/03/1957
ALLOC 3A Bescot 4w/e 29/11/1958
ALLOC 2B Nuneaton 5w/e 03/03/1962
ALLOC 21B Bescot 5w/e 05/05/1962
WDN   w/e 22/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1897 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1816
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3821
   
11/1927 Renumbered Renumbered to 9045    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bescot (3A)    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 49045    
23/03/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Aston (3D)    
29/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Bescot (3A)    
24/02/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
05/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Bescot (21B)    
22/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 49045    

prev prev