Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 209 Today
» 1257 Yesterday
» 5326 Week
» 25768 Month
» 362614 Year
» 1584179 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 1819 m/e 12/1897
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9058 m/e 01/1928
British Railways 49058 m/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class A Compound
Company History LNWR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
A12/1897
D10/1908
G102/1928
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 3824
To Service During 12/1897
Withdrawal During 03/1950
Service Life 52 yrs, 2 mths , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1897
8D Widnes on 01/01/1948
2D Nuneaton 3w/e 11/12/1948
   Withdrawn m/e 03/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 2D Nuneaton w/e 27/11/1948
ALLOC 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) w/e 20/08/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1897 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1819
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3824
   
01/1928 Renumbered Renumbered to 9058    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Widnes (8D)    
11/12/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2D)    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 49058 but not taken up    
03/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 9058    

prev prev