Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 331 Today
» 1224 Yesterday
» 4143 Week
» 33641 Month
» 370487 Year
» 1592052 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 1821 m/e 04/1898
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9064 m/e 08/1926
British Railways 49064 m/e 08/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class A Compound
Company History LNWR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
A04/1898
D03/1909
G108/1926
G2A01/1939
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 3826
To Service During 04/1898
Withdrawal w/e Sat 04/06/1960
Service Life 62 yrs, 2 mths , 4 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 04/1898
4E Tredegar on 01/01/1948
8A Edge Hill w/e 12/09/1959
   Withdrawn w/e 04/06/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 8A Edge Hill 3w/e 26/09/1959
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region m/e 30/09/1959
WDN   w/e 04/06/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1898 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1821
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3826
   
08/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 9064    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Tredegar (4E)    
08/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 49064    
12/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
04/06/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 49064    

prev prev