Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1286 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19089 Week
» 72105 Month
» 191632 Year
» 3218485 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
1824 |
m/e |
04/1898 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9035 |
m/e |
12/1927 |
British Railways |
49035 |
m/e |
09/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
A Compound |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
3829 |
To Service |
During 04/1898 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Thu 24/01/1957 (At Crewe Works) |
Withdrawal Notes |
At Crewe Works |
Service Life |
58 yrs, 9 mths , 24 dys |
Total Mileage |
1,146,725 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/01/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1898 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1824 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3829 |
|
|
12/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9035 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (4B) |
|
|
09/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49035 |
|
|
24/01/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49035 |
|
|
08/02/1957 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire |
|
|