Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 108 Today
» 1249 Yesterday
» 2696 Week
» 32194 Month
» 369040 Year
» 1590605 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 1825 m/e 04/1898
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9053 m/e 06/1927
British Railways 49053 m/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class A Compound
Company History LNWR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
A04/1898
D08/1908
G105/1929
G2A06/1947
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 3830
To Service During 04/1898
Withdrawal During 05/1950
Service Life 52 yrs , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 04/1898
10A Springs Branch (Wigan) on 01/01/1948
10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 3w/e 11/12/1948
   Withdrawn m/e 05/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) w/e 27/11/1948

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/10/1945 Longsight MPD Unusual visitors during October were: 4178 19B, 5185 10B, 5219 26A, 8824 10A, 9053 10A, 12378 26E. SLS/194601

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1898 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1825
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3830
   
06/1927 Renumbered Renumbered to 9053    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A)    
11/12/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (10E)    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 49053 but not taken up    
05/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 9053    

prev prev