Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 82 Today
» 1257 Yesterday
» 5199 Week
» 25641 Month
» 362487 Year
» 1584052 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 1834 m/e 07/1898
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9028 m/e 12/1927
British Railways 49028 m/e 10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class A Compound
Company History LNWR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
A07/1898
D08/1907
G108/1930
G2A12/1939
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 3839
To Service During 07/1898
Withdrawal w/e Sat 03/03/1956
Service Life 57 yrs, 8 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1898
4A Shrewsbury on 01/01/1948
85C Hereford 4w/e 04/12/1954
84G Shrewsbury 8w/e 26/03/1955
   Withdrawn w/e 03/03/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 4D Abergavenny w/e 12/03/1949
ALLOC 85C Hereford 4w/e 04/12/1954
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 26/02/1955
WDN   m/e 29/02/1956
WDN   w/e 03/03/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1898 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1834
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3839
   
12/1927 Renumbered Renumbered to 9028    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Shrewsbury (4A)    
10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 49028    
04/12/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Hereford (85C)    
26/03/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
03/03/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 49028    

prev prev