Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 1028 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18831 Week
» 71847 Month
» 191374 Year
» 3218227 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
1845 |
m/e |
10/1898 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9003 |
m/e |
10/1927 |
British Railways |
49003 |
m/e |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
A Compound |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
3850 |
To Service |
During 10/1898 |
Withdrawal |
During 03/1949 |
Service Life |
50 yrs, 4 mths , 29 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1898 |
3C |
|
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
03/1949 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
3B |
Bushbury |
w/e |
13/12/1947 |
ALLOC |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
w/e |
20/12/1947 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
12/03/1949 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1898 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1845 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3850 |
|
|
10/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9003 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C) |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 49003 but not taken up |
|
|
03/1949 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 9003 |
|
|