Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 94 Today
» 1279 Yesterday
» 7763 Week
» 94 Month
» 374107 Year
» 1595672 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 1846 m/e 10/1898
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9059 m/e 01/1928
British Railways 49059 m/e 08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class A Compound
Company History LNWR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
A10/1898
D10/1908
G101/1928
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 3851
To Service During 10/1898
Withdrawal w/e Sat 11/02/1950
Service Life 51 yrs, 4 mths , 12 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1898
9D Buxton (LNWR) on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn w/e 11/02/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 6B Mold Junction w/e 01/05/1948
ALLOC 3A Bescot w/e 26/03/1949
WDN   w/e 11/02/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1948 Crewe Works New Work December: 'IV° more '2F' 2-6-0's were completed dunng December-Nos. 46433 and 46434 on 8/12 and 13/12 respectively, thus completing the present order. Tne last Caprotti 4-6-0 of Order E 468, No. 44757, was completed on 22/12. No. 44728 (No. 11 of Order E 472) was completed on 31/12; the first ten of this order are to be built at Horwich. Another 'Patriot' Class 4-6-0, No. 45534, has been rebuilt with a taper boiler-completed on 10/12. No. 45522 will shortly be similarly dealt with.
Locomotives entering Works during December included: Nos. 1201, 2254, 2438/51/61/77/82, 2654/60/86/99, 2610/14/18/28/44/48/78/82, 4739/48/49, 4849/84, 4908/17/18/31/50/81, 5000/24/41/55/59/68/93, 5108/40/47, 5274/93, 4387, 5404/44/94, 5508/33/46, 5617/30/33/36/54/55/66/78, 5705, 6115/19/37/47/50/52/56, 6207/31/49/53, 6654, 6656(27A), 6727, 7757, 7803, 7987/99, 8001/63/93/98, 8143/89/97, 8200/71/80, 8373, 8409/17/39/62, 8509/20, 8606/34/51/53/59/96, 8700/03/18, 9072/85, 9122/26/64/84, 924/57/67/93, 9321/33/49, 9416/19/47, 28093, 42386, 42565, 44766, 44830, 45005/80, 46107/12/17/20/21, 47977, 49059, 49298, 58924. During w/e 8/12, No. 46121 was renamed The Highland Light Infantry (Glasgow Regiment) and fitted with a plaque.
SLS/194902

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1898 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1846
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3851
   
01/1928 Renumbered Renumbered to 9059    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Buxton (LNWR) (9D)    
08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 49059    
11/02/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 49059    

prev prev