Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 359 Today
» 1315 Yesterday
» 359 Week
» 29857 Month
» 366703 Year
» 1588268 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 1854 m/e 02/1899
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9023 m/e 02/1928
British Railways 49023 m/e 05/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class A Compound
Company History LNWR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
A02/1899
D06/1907
G102/1928
G2A02/1942
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 3891
To Service During 02/1899
Withdrawal w/e Sat 07/10/1961
Service Life 62 yrs, 8 mths , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 02/1899
10A Springs Branch (Wigan) on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn w/e 07/10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 11A Carnforth w/e 24/04/1948
ALLOC 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 31/07/1948
WDN   w/e 07/10/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1899 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1854
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3891
   
02/1928 Renumbered Renumbered to 9023    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A)    
05/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 49023    
07/10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 49023    

prev prev