Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 139 Today
» 1257 Yesterday
» 5256 Week
» 25698 Month
» 362544 Year
» 1584109 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 1863 m/e 05/1899
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9006 m/e 11/1927
British Railways 49006 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class A Compound
Company History LNWR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
A05/1899
D07/1906
G111/1927
G2A05/1944
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 3900
To Service During 05/1899
Withdrawal w/e Sat 26/05/1951
Service Life 52 yrs , 26 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1899
4D Abergavenny on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn w/e 26/05/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 3A Bescot 4w/e 10/11/1945
ALLOC 8A Edge Hill w/e 07/08/1948
ALLOC 4D Abergavenny w/e 18/09/1948
WDN   w/e 26/05/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1899 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1863
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3900
   
11/1927 Renumbered Renumbered to 9006    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Abergavenny (4D)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 49006    
26/05/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 49006    

prev prev