Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 697 Today
» 1249 Yesterday
» 3285 Week
» 32783 Month
» 369629 Year
» 1591194 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 1864 m/e 05/1899
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9063 m/e 12/1927
British Railways 49063 m/e 02/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class A Compound
Company History LNWR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
A05/1899
D06/1909
G103/1930
G2A09/1946
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 3901
To Service During 05/1899
Withdrawal Sat 29/08/1959
Service Life 60 yrs, 3 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1899
3A Bescot on 01/01/1948
3D Aston 4w/e 23/03/1957
3A Bescot w/e 29/11/1958
   Withdrawn on 29/08/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 3D Aston 4w/e 23/03/1957
ALLOC 3A Bescot 4w/e 29/11/1958
WDN   on 29/08/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1899 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1864
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3901
   
12/1927 Renumbered Renumbered to 9063    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bescot (3A)    
02/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 49063    
23/03/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Aston (3D)    
29/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Bescot (3A)    
29/08/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 49063    

prev prev