Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 111 Today
» 1249 Yesterday
» 2699 Week
» 32197 Month
» 369043 Year
» 1590608 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 1873 m/e 05/1900
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9007 m/e 02/1928
British Railways 49007 m/e 04/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class A Compound
Company History LNWR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
A05/1900
D07/1906
G103/1926
G2A02/1940
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 4027
To Service During 05/1900
Withdrawal w/e Sat 07/10/1961
Service Life 61 yrs, 5 mths , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1900
2B Bletchley on 01/01/1948
10A Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 24/03/1951
9B Stockport Edgeley 4w/e 25/02/1956
10A Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 21/04/1956
   Withdrawn w/e 07/10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 4A Shrewsbury w/e 19/04/1947
ALLOC 2B Bletchley w/e 06/09/1947
ALLOC 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 10/03/1951
LOAN 9B Stockport Edgeley 4w/e 25/02/1956
EXLOAN 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 21/04/1956
WDN   w/e 07/10/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1900 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1873
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4027
   
02/1928 Renumbered Renumbered to 9007    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bletchley (2B)    
24/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A)    
04/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 49007    
25/02/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B)    
21/04/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A)    
07/10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 49007    

prev prev