Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 14 Today
» 1249 Yesterday
» 2602 Week
» 32100 Month
» 368946 Year
» 1590511 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 1877 m/e 05/1900
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9046 m/e 12/1927
British Railways 49046 w/e 05/06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class A Compound
Company History LNWR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
A05/1900
D04/1908
G112/1927
G2A06/1940
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 4031
To Service During 05/1900
Withdrawal w/e Fri 08/03/1957 (At Crewe Works)
Total Mileage 1,157,357
Scrapping w/e Fri 22/03/1957 at Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
Service Life 56 yrs, 10 mths , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1900
4A Shrewsbury on 01/01/1948
85C Hereford 4w/e 01/01/1955
   Stored (Hereford) on 09/10/1955
85C Hereford (Reinstated) on 28/11/1955
   Withdrawn w/e 08/03/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 4A Shrewsbury w/e 13/03/1948
ALLOC 4D Abergavenny w/e 18/06/1949
ALLOC 85C Hereford 4w/e 01/01/1955
WDN   m/e 31/03/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1900 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1877
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4031
   
12/1927 Renumbered Renumbered to 9046    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Shrewsbury (4A)    
05/06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 49046    
01/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Hereford (85C)    
09/10/1955 To Store To Store (Hereford)    
28/11/1955 Reinstated Reinstated to Hereford (85C)    
08/03/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 49046    

prev prev