Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 1100 Today
» 1296 Yesterday
» 6208 Week
» 35706 Month
» 372552 Year
» 1594117 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 1880 m/e 05/1900
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9037 m/e 01/1928
British Railways 49037 m/e 09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class A Compound
Company History LNWR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
A05/1900
D12/1907
G101/1928
G2A07/1940
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 4034
To Service During 05/1900
Withdrawal w/e Sat 29/12/1962
Service Life 62 yrs, 7 mths , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1900
2B Bletchley on 01/01/1948
8A Edge Hill w/e 12/11/1960
   Withdrawn w/e 29/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 2B Bletchley w/e 19/04/1947
ALLOC 3B Bushbury w/e 16/04/1949
ALLOC 8A Edge Hill 5w/e 03/12/1960
WDN   w/e 29/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1900 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1880
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4034
   
01/1928 Renumbered Renumbered to 9037    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bletchley (2B)    
09/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 49037    
12/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 49037    

prev prev