Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 232 Today
» 1257 Yesterday
» 5349 Week
» 25791 Month
» 362637 Year
» 1584202 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 1884 m/e 09/1901
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9266 m/e 11/1926
British Railways 49266 m/e 06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class 4 Cylinder Compound
Company History LNWR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B09/1901
E12/1904
G108/1917
G2A08/1941
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 4158
To Service During 09/1901
Withdrawal w/e Sat 14/11/1959
Service Life 58 yrs, 2 mths , 14 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1901
3A Bescot on 01/01/1948
8C Speke Junction 4w/e 09/10/1954
2C Warwick 4w/e 23/03/1957
2A Rugby 4w/e 04/10/1958
   Withdrawn w/e 14/11/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 3A Bescot w/e 24/05/1947
ALLOC 8C Speke Junction 4w/e 02/10/1954
ALLOC 2C Warwick 4w/e 23/03/1957
ALLOC 2A Rugby 4w/e 04/10/1958
WDN   w/e 14/11/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1901 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1884
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4158
   
11/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 9266    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bescot (3A)    
06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 49266    
09/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C)    
23/03/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Warwick (2C)    
04/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Rugby (2A)    
14/11/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 49266    

prev prev