Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 352 Today
» 1315 Yesterday
» 352 Week
» 29850 Month
» 366696 Year
» 1588261 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 1885 m/e 09/1901
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9267 m/e 08/1923
British Railways 49267 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class 4 Cylinder Compound
Company History LNWR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B09/1901
E01/1905
G108/1917
G2A11/1946
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 4159
To Service During 09/1901
Withdrawal w/e Sat 01/12/1962
Service Life 61 yrs, 3 mths , 0 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1901
5B Crewe South on 01/01/1948
10A Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 20/04/1957
   Withdrawn w/e 01/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 5B Crewe South w/e 19/10/1946
ALLOC 10B Preston w/e 21/08/1948
ALLOC 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 20/04/1957
WDN   w/e 01/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1901 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1885
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4159
   
08/1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 9267    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Crewe South (5B)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 49267    
20/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A)    
01/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 49267    

prev prev