Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 101 Today
» 1249 Yesterday
» 2689 Week
» 32187 Month
» 369033 Year
» 1590598 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 1887 m/e 09/1901
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9148 m/e 02/1927
British Railways 49148 m/e 06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class 4 Cylinder Compound
Company History LNWR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B09/1901
G08/1914
G101/1936
G2A06/1941
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 4161
To Service During 09/1901
Withdrawal w/e Wed 31/07/1957 (At Derby Works)
Total Mileage 1,085,284
Scrapping w/e Thu 25/07/1957 at Locomotive Works (Derby)
Service Life 55 yrs , 11 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1901
4D Abergavenny on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn w/e 31/07/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 4B Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) w/e 17/01/1948
WDN   m/e 31/07/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1901 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1887
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4161
   
02/1927 Renumbered Renumbered to 9148    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Abergavenny (4D)    
06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 49148    
31/07/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 49148    

prev prev