Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 3468 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16874 Week
» 69890 Month
» 189417 Year
» 3216270 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
1889 |
m/e |
09/1901 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9345 |
m/e |
12/1927 |
British Railways |
49345 |
m/e |
10/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
4 Cylinder Compound |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
4163 |
To Service |
During 09/1901 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 31/01/1958 |
Service Life |
56 yrs , 5 mths |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
09/1901 |
2D |
|
Nuneaton |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
4D |
|
Abergavenny |
w/e |
15/10/1949 |
84G |
|
Shrewsbury |
4w/e |
04/12/1954 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
31/01/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
4D |
Abergavenny |
w/e |
15/10/1949 |
ALLOC |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
4w/e |
04/12/1954 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/01/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1901 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1889 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4163 |
|
|
12/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9345 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Nuneaton (2D) |
|
|
15/10/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Abergavenny (4D) |
|
|
10/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49345 |
|
|
04/12/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G) |
|
|
31/01/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49345 |
|
|