Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 1272 Today
» 1257 Yesterday
» 6389 Week
» 26831 Month
» 363677 Year
» 1585242 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 1890 m/e 09/1901
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 8901 m/e 11/1926
British Railways 48901 m/e 09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class 4 Cylinder Compound
Company History LNWR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B09/1901
G103/1924
G2A01/1947
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 4164
To Service During 09/1901
Withdrawal w/e Sat 17/05/1952
Service Life 50 yrs, 8 mths , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1901
2A Rugby on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn w/e 17/05/1952

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
EXLOAN 2A Rugby w/e 24/05/1947
ALLOC 4A Shrewsbury w/e 25/09/1948
WDN   w/e 17/05/1952

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1901 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1890
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4164
   
11/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 8901    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Rugby (2A)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 48901    
17/05/1952 Withdrawn Condemned as 48901    

prev prev