Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 1050 Today
» 1296 Yesterday
» 6158 Week
» 35656 Month
» 372502 Year
» 1594067 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 1892 m/e 12/1901
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 8902 m/e 01/1928
British Railways 48902 m/e 12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class 4 Cylinder Compound
Company History LNWR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B12/1901
G105/1925
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 4186
To Service During 12/1901
Withdrawal w/e Sat 21/02/1953
Service Life 51 yrs, 2 mths , 22 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1901
2B Bletchley on 01/01/1948
3D Aston 4w/e 12/07/1952
   Withdrawn w/e 21/02/1953

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 2B Bletchley w/e 09/11/1946
ALLOC 2D Nuneaton w/e 15/05/1948
ALLOC 3B Bushbury w/e 15/10/1949
ALLOC 3D Aston 4w/e 12/07/1952
WDN   w/e 21/02/1953

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1901 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1892
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4186
   
01/1928 Renumbered Renumbered to 8902    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bletchley (2B)    
12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 48902    
12/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Aston (3D)    
21/02/1953 Withdrawn Condemned as 48902    

prev prev