Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 31 Online
» 1284 Today
» 1315 Yesterday
» 1284 Week
» 30782 Month
» 367628 Year
» 1589193 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 1898 m/e 12/1901
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9385 m/e 09/1926
British Railways 49385 m/e 12/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class 4 Cylinder Compound
Company History LNWR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B12/1901
G110/1922
G2A09/1947
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 4192
To Service During 12/1901
Withdrawal w/e Sat 21/12/1957
Service Life 56 yrs , 21 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1901
8A Edge Hill on 01/01/1948
4A Bletchley 4w/e 17/07/1951
10A Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 06/10/1951
   Withdrawn w/e 21/12/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 2B Bletchley w/e 13/05/1950
ALLOC 4A Bletchley w/e 30/06/1951
ALLOC 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 15/09/1951
WDN   w/e 21/12/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/03/1952 Locomotives still carrying old numbers (LMS) Engines running with L.M.S. Numbers. (March 1952) 407, 493, 682, 1324, 1370, 2093, 2994/8, 3062, 3253, 3301/32, 3436, 3514, 3622/62, 3731/49, 3820, 4245, 4436, 6899, 7112/28/29/91, 7377/81, 7407/19/23/96, 7625, 7752, 7822, 8278, 8310, 8510, 8602, 8745, 8921/51, 9010/61, 9108/16/29/99, 9265/70/75/77, 9330/85, 9417, 10725/35, 10807/92, 11537, 12123, 12203/69/93, 16039, 22900/65, 28107/28, 28251, 28312, 28580/3/9. In works: 7597, 4003. Uncertain: 609, 2994 (? done and not advised). SLS/195206

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1901 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1898
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4192
   
09/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 9385    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Edge Hill (8A)    
17/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bletchley (4A)    
06/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A)    
12/1952 Renumbered Renumbered to 49385    
21/12/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 49385    

prev prev