Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 544 Today
» 1282 Yesterday
» 6934 Week
» 36432 Month
» 373278 Year
» 1594843 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 1899 m/e 12/1901
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9382 m/e 05/1927
British Railways 49382 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class 4 Cylinder Compound
Company History LNWR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B12/1901
G106/1922
G2A11/1940
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 4193
To Service During 12/1901
Withdrawal w/e Sat 22/09/1962
Service Life 60 yrs, 9 mths , 23 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1901
25G Farnley Junction on 01/01/1948
24C Lostock Hall w/e 16/09/1961
26F Patricroft w/e 23/09/1961
   Withdrawn w/e 22/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 10B Preston w/e 12/03/1949
ALLOC 10B Preston w/e 02/04/1949
ALLOC 26F Patricroft 4w/e 30/09/1961
WDN   w/e 22/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1901 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1899
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4193
   
05/1927 Renumbered Renumbered to 9382    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Farnley Junction (25G)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 49382    
16/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Lostock Hall (24C)    
23/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Patricroft (26F)    
22/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 49382    

prev prev