Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 84 Today
» 1279 Yesterday
» 7753 Week
» 84 Month
» 374097 Year
» 1595662 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 843 m/e 04/1902
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 8906 m/e 01/1926
British Railways 48906 m/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class 4 Cylinder Compound
Company History LNWR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B04/1902
G110/1923
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 4239
To Service During 04/1902
Withdrawal During 03/1949
Service Life 46 yrs, 10 mths , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 04/1902
5B Crewe South on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn m/e 03/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 2D Nuneaton w/e 24/04/1948
EXLOAN 5B Crewe South w/e 15/05/1948
ALLOC 9A Longsight w/e 21/08/1948

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1902 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 843
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4239
   
01/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 8906    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Crewe South (5B)    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 48906 but not taken up    
03/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 8906    

prev prev