Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 3434 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16840 Week
» 69856 Month
» 189383 Year
» 3216236 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
898 |
m/e |
04/1902 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9146 |
m/e |
05/1927 |
British Railways |
49146 |
m/e |
07/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
4 Cylinder Compound |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
4241 |
To Service |
During 04/1902 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 28/02/1958 |
Service Life |
55 yrs, 10 mths , 28 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1902 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 898 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4241 |
|
|
05/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9146 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Abergavenny (4D) |
|
|
07/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49146 |
|
|
04/12/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hereford (85C) |
|
|
20/04/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (87K) |
|
|
28/02/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49146 |
|
|