Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 1238 Today
» 1257 Yesterday
» 6355 Week
» 26797 Month
» 363643 Year
» 1585208 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 2114 m/e 05/1902
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9386 m/e 05/1927
British Railways 49386 m/e 01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class 4 Cylinder Compound
Company History LNWR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B05/1902
F07/1908
G110/1922
G2A05/1939
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 4249
To Service During 05/1902
Withdrawal w/e Sat 28/11/1959
Service Life 57 yrs, 6 mths , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1902
9D Buxton (LNWR) on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn w/e 28/11/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam w/e 17/01/1948
ALLOC 10C Patricroft w/e 29/04/1950
WDN   w/e 28/11/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/01/1949 Crewe Works Locomotives entering Works during January included Nos. C.D. No. 7, 2236, 2428/46/53/74, 2562/79/80/98, 2624/74/85/86, 4777, 4812/23/68/76, 4965, 5103/6/29/49, 5200/22/84/94, 5317/18/53/54/72/75/83, 5427/49, 5516/24/94/98, 5650/65/84, 5719, 6111/18/22/28/45/46/64, 6204/50, 7181, 7937/51/73/81/85, 8007/80/93/96, 8177/99, 8220/5, 8327/38/45/47, 8417/24/35/42, 8501/2, 8607/28/49, 8705/23/70, 8892/4, 8909/35, 9217/27/90, 9386, 25673, 27591, 27635, 28337, 42150, 42225, 42458, 42589, 42619, 44753/66, 44822/70, 45027/76, 45513/30/65/72/89, 45618/60/85, 45721, 46220/21/29/39, 46603, 48004, 48114, 49307. During the past month new construction accounted for a further six Class '5' 4-6-0's of Order E472. They were completed as follows:- Nos. 44729 (7/1), 44730 (12/1), 44731 (17/1), 44732 (24/1), 44733 (28/1) and 44734 (3/2); the last three engines of this order are already in an advanced state of completion. The latest 'Patriot' Class 4-6-0 to be rebuilt is No. 45522-completed on 21/1; at the present time no more are in hand.
Since the cessation of hostilities the former L.M.S.Rly. have fitted several different types of speedometer to certain of their 4-6-0 locomotives. These experiments were carried a stage further last month when during W.E. 22/1 Class '7P' No. 46257 was fitted with a Smiths type speedometer driven from the pony truck axle, the generator being mounted on the left-hand axlebox.
Ex L.N.W. 'Cauliflower' 0-6-0's. Nos. 58409/12 were fitted for snowplough duties during the same week. The equipment includes ex-tended cab roofs, and look-out windows (similar to those seen on many brake vans) mounted on the cab sides.
Since October last, several 'Dean' 0-6-0 pannier tanks have undergone heavy repairs here; those having passed through Works to date include Nos. 2021/67, 2100/09/11/15/27/50/84/85. All have had their numberplates painted red, with the numerals scoured bright. Another ex L. & Y. 0-6-0ST has been added to the stud of Works' shunting locomotives-No. 11444, which now brings the total of ex L. & Y. engines represented to three.
SLS/194903

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1902 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2114
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4249
   
05/1927 Renumbered Renumbered to 9386    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Buxton (LNWR) (9D)    
01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 49386    
28/11/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 49386    

prev prev