Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 717 Today
» 1249 Yesterday
» 3305 Week
» 32803 Month
» 369649 Year
» 1591214 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 2496 m/e 05/1902
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 8911 m/e 09/1928
British Railways 48911 m/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class 4 Cylinder Compound
Company History LNWR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B05/1902
G104/1923
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 4252
To Service During 05/1902
Withdrawal Sat 31/12/1949 off Aston (3D)
Service Life 47 yrs, 8 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1902
2D Nuneaton on 01/01/1948
3D Aston 5w/e 16/07/1949
   Withdrawn on 31/12/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 2E Warwick w/e 24/05/1947
ALLOC 2A Rugby w/e 30/08/1947
ALLOC 2D Nuneaton w/e 18/10/1947
ALLOC 2F Coventry w/e 29/01/1949
ALLOC 3D Aston w/e 23/07/1949
WDN   w/e 31/12/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1902 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2496
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4252
   
09/1928 Renumbered Renumbered to 8911    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Nuneaton (2D)    
16/07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Aston (3D)    
31/12/1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 48911 but not taken up    
31/12/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 8911 from Aston (3D)    

prev prev