Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 121 Today
» 1249 Yesterday
» 2709 Week
» 32207 Month
» 369053 Year
» 1590618 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 2560 m/e 08/1902
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 8915 m/e 10/1927
British Railways 48915 m/e 02/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class 4 Cylinder Compound
Company History LNWR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B08/1902
G104/1923
G2A05/1946
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 4259
To Service During 08/1902
Withdrawal w/e Sat 07/10/1961
Service Life 59 yrs, 2 mths , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1902
1C Watford on 01/01/1948
10A Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 11/08/1956
   Withdrawn w/e 07/10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 14/07/1956
WDN   w/e 07/10/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1902 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2560
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4259
   
10/1927 Renumbered Renumbered to 8915    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Watford (1C)    
02/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 48915    
11/08/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A)    
07/10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 48915    

prev prev