Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 71 Today
» 1257 Yesterday
» 5188 Week
» 25630 Month
» 362476 Year
» 1584041 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 1035 m/e 09/1902
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9133 m/e 09/1927
British Railways 49133 m/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class 4 Cylinder Compound
Company History LNWR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B09/1902
G09/1910
G109/1923
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 4267
To Service During 09/1902
Withdrawal During 02/1950
Service Life 47 yrs , 5 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1902
2A Rugby on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn m/e 02/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 2F Coventry w/e 26/02/1949
ALLOC 2A Rugby w/e 30/04/1949
ALLOC 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) w/e 04/06/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1902 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1035
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4267
   
09/1927 Renumbered Renumbered to 9133    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Rugby (2A)    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 49133 but not taken up    
02/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 9133    

prev prev