Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 132 Today
» 1257 Yesterday
» 5249 Week
» 25691 Month
» 362537 Year
» 1584102 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 2567 m/e 10/1902
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 8921 m/e 11/1926
British Railways 48921 m/e 09/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class 4 Cylinder Compound
Company History LNWR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B10/1902
G105/1924
G2A03/1940
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 4276
To Service During 10/1902
Withdrawal Wed 30/04/1958
Service Life 55 yrs , 7 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1902
4E Tredegar on 01/01/1948
84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 22/03/1958
   Withdrawn m/e 30/04/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
EXLOAN 8B Warrington Dallam w/e 21/06/1947
ALLOC 4E Tredegar w/e 20/12/1947
WDN   m/e 30/04/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/03/1952 Locomotives still carrying old numbers (LMS) Engines running with L.M.S. Numbers. (March 1952) 407, 493, 682, 1324, 1370, 2093, 2994/8, 3062, 3253, 3301/32, 3436, 3514, 3622/62, 3731/49, 3820, 4245, 4436, 6899, 7112/28/29/91, 7377/81, 7407/19/23/96, 7625, 7752, 7822, 8278, 8310, 8510, 8602, 8745, 8921/51, 9010/61, 9108/16/29/99, 9265/70/75/77, 9330/85, 9417, 10725/35, 10807/92, 11537, 12123, 12203/69/93, 16039, 22900/65, 28107/28, 28251, 28312, 28580/3/9. In works: 7597, 4003. Uncertain: 609, 2994 (? done and not advised). SLS/195206

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1902 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2567
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4276
   
11/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 8921    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Tredegar (4E)    
09/1952 Renumbered Renumbered to 48921    
22/03/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
30/04/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 48921    

prev prev