Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 83 Today
» 1279 Yesterday
» 7752 Week
» 83 Month
» 374096 Year
» 1595661 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 2568 m/e 10/1902
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9342 m/e 12/1927
British Railways 49342 m/e 09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class 4 Cylinder Compound
Company History LNWR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B10/1902
G112/1919
G2A10/1935
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 4277
To Service During 10/1902
Withdrawal w/e Sat 14/10/1961
Scrapping Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 59 yrs , 14 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1902
2D Nuneaton on 01/01/1948
2B Nuneaton 8w/e 29/11/1952
   Withdrawn w/e 14/10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 1A Willesden w/e 26/02/1949
ALLOC 2B Nuneaton 4w/e 29/11/1952
WDN   w/e 14/10/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1902 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2568
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4277
   
12/1927 Renumbered Renumbered to 9342    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Nuneaton (2D)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 49342    
29/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
14/10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 49342    

prev prev