Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 63 Today
» 1249 Yesterday
» 2651 Week
» 32149 Month
» 368995 Year
» 1590560 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 2569 m/e 10/1902
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9072 m/e 03/1927
British Railways 49072 m/e 01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class 4 Cylinder Compound
Company History LNWR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B10/1902
G09/1909
G103/1932
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 4278
To Service During 10/1902
Withdrawal w/e Sat 26/02/1949
Service Life 46 yrs, 4 mths , 27 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1902
6B Mold Junction on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn w/e 26/02/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 14/02/1948
ALLOC 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) w/e 28/08/1948
WDN   w/e 26/02/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1948 Crewe Works New Work December: 'IV° more '2F' 2-6-0's were completed dunng December-Nos. 46433 and 46434 on 8/12 and 13/12 respectively, thus completing the present order. Tne last Caprotti 4-6-0 of Order E 468, No. 44757, was completed on 22/12. No. 44728 (No. 11 of Order E 472) was completed on 31/12; the first ten of this order are to be built at Horwich. Another 'Patriot' Class 4-6-0, No. 45534, has been rebuilt with a taper boiler-completed on 10/12. No. 45522 will shortly be similarly dealt with.
Locomotives entering Works during December included: Nos. 1201, 2254, 2438/51/61/77/82, 2654/60/86/99, 2610/14/18/28/44/48/78/82, 4739/48/49, 4849/84, 4908/17/18/31/50/81, 5000/24/41/55/59/68/93, 5108/40/47, 5274/93, 4387, 5404/44/94, 5508/33/46, 5617/30/33/36/54/55/66/78, 5705, 6115/19/37/47/50/52/56, 6207/31/49/53, 6654, 6656(27A), 6727, 7757, 7803, 7987/99, 8001/63/93/98, 8143/89/97, 8200/71/80, 8373, 8409/17/39/62, 8509/20, 8606/34/51/53/59/96, 8700/03/18, 9072/85, 9122/26/64/84, 924/57/67/93, 9321/33/49, 9416/19/47, 28093, 42386, 42565, 44766, 44830, 45005/80, 46107/12/17/20/21, 47977, 49059, 49298, 58924. During w/e 8/12, No. 46121 was renamed The Highland Light Infantry (Glasgow Regiment) and fitted with a plaque.
SLS/194902

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1902 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2569
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4278
   
03/1927 Renumbered Renumbered to 9072    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Mold Junction (6B)    
01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 49072    
26/02/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 49072    

prev prev