Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 113 Today
» 1249 Yesterday
» 2701 Week
» 32199 Month
» 369045 Year
» 1590610 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 1094 m/e 12/1902
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9324 m/e 08/1928
British Railways 49324 m/e 04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class 4 Cylinder Compound
Company History LNWR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B12/1902
G110/1918
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 4301
To Service During 12/1902
Withdrawal w/e Sat 04/03/1950
Service Life 47 yrs, 3 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1902
2C Northampton on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn w/e 04/03/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 5C Stafford w/e 15/05/1948
ALLOC 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) w/e 05/11/1949
WDN   w/e 04/03/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1902 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1094
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4301
   
08/1928 Renumbered Renumbered to 9324    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Northampton (2C)    
04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 49324    
04/03/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 49324    

prev prev