Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 102 Today
» 1249 Yesterday
» 2690 Week
» 32188 Month
» 369034 Year
» 1590599 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 1225 m/e 01/1903
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 8926 m/e 06/1928
British Railways 48926 m/e 01/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class 4 Cylinder Compound
Company History LNWR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B01/1903
G102/1926
G2A09/1945
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 4306
To Service During 01/1903
Withdrawal Sat 29/08/1959
Service Life 56 yrs, 7 mths , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 01/1903
2A Rugby on 01/01/1948
8B Warrington Dallam 5w/e 24/12/1949
   Withdrawn on 29/08/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 2A Rugby w/e 05/07/1947
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam w/e 10/12/1949
ALLOC 10C Patricroft w/e 29/04/1950
WDN   on 29/08/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1903 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1225
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4306
   
06/1928 Renumbered Renumbered to 8926    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Rugby (2A)    
24/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B)    
01/1952 Renumbered Renumbered to 48926    
29/08/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 48926    

prev prev