Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1171 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18974 Week
» 71990 Month
» 191517 Year
» 3218370 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
1237 |
m/e |
03/1903 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8929 |
m/e |
10/1923 |
British Railways |
48929 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
4 Cylinder Compound |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
4315 |
To Service |
During 03/1903 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 29/07/1950 |
Service Life |
47 yrs , 5 mths |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1903 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1237 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4315 |
|
|
10/1923 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8929 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Northampton (2C) |
|
|
15/05/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B) |
|
|
06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48929 |
|
|
20/11/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
11/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
29/07/1950 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48929 |
|
|