Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 63 Today
» 1257 Yesterday
» 5180 Week
» 25622 Month
» 362468 Year
» 1584033 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 1241 m/e 04/1903
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9346 m/e 07/1927
British Railways 49346 m/e 05/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class 4 Cylinder Compound
Company History LNWR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B04/1903
G109/1920
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 4317
To Service During 04/1903
Withdrawal w/e Sat 10/05/1952
Service Life 49 yrs, 1 mth , 9 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 04/1903
2D Nuneaton on 01/01/1948
3B Bushbury 4w/e 09/09/1950
3D Aston 4w/e 24/03/1951
   Withdrawn w/e 10/05/1952

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 2B Bletchley w/e 08/11/1947
EXLOAN 2D Nuneaton w/e 29/11/1947
ALLOC 8A Edge Hill w/e 21/08/1948
ALLOC 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 08/10/1949
ALLOC 3B Bushbury w/e 26/08/1950
ALLOC 3D Aston w/e 24/03/1951
WDN   w/e 10/05/1952

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1903 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1241
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4317
   
07/1927 Renumbered Renumbered to 9346    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Nuneaton (2D)    
05/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 49346    
09/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Bushbury (3B)    
24/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Aston (3D)    
10/05/1952 Withdrawn Condemned as 49346    

prev prev