Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 89 Today
» 1257 Yesterday
» 5206 Week
» 25648 Month
» 362494 Year
» 1584059 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 1271 m/e 04/1903
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9145 m/e 03/1928
British Railways 49145 m/e 07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class 4 Cylinder Compound
Company History LNWR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B04/1903
G11/1910
G112/1931
G2A04/1944
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 4324
To Service During 04/1903
Withdrawal w/e Sat 04/01/1958
Service Life 54 yrs, 9 mths , 4 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 04/1903
1C Watford on 01/01/1948
10A Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 11/08/1956
   Withdrawn w/e 04/01/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 14/07/1956
WDN   w/e 04/01/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1903 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1271
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4324
   
03/1928 Renumbered Renumbered to 9145    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Watford (1C)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 49145    
11/08/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A)    
04/01/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 49145    

prev prev