Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 382 Today
» 1315 Yesterday
» 382 Week
» 29880 Month
» 366726 Year
» 1588291 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 1272 m/e 05/1903
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 8932 m/e 08/1927
British Railways 48932 m/e 09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class 4 Cylinder Compound
Company History LNWR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B05/1903
G103/1924
G2A11/1940
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 4325
To Service During 05/1903
Withdrawal w/e Sat 07/10/1961
Service Life 58 yrs, 5 mths , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1903
4D Abergavenny on 01/01/1948
3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 4w/e 11/08/1956
9D Buxton (LNWR) 4w/e 20/04/1957
   Withdrawn w/e 07/10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 8A Edge Hill w/e 21/08/1948
ALLOC 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 4w/e 14/07/1956
ALLOC 9D Buxton (LNWR) 4w/e 20/04/1957
WDN   w/e 07/10/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1903 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1272
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4325
   
08/1927 Renumbered Renumbered to 8932    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Abergavenny (4D)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 48932    
11/08/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C)    
20/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9D)    
07/10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 48932    

prev prev