Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 390 Today
» 1224 Yesterday
» 4202 Week
» 33700 Month
» 370546 Year
» 1592111 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 2574 m/e 05/1903
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9343 m/e 08/1927
British Railways 49343 m/e 06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class 4 Cylinder Compound
Company History LNWR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B05/1903
E10/1906
G101/1920
G2A06/1941
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 4333
To Service During 05/1903
Withdrawal w/e Sat 14/10/1961
Scrapping Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 58 yrs, 5 mths , 14 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1903
9A Longsight on 01/01/1948
3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 4w/e 30/11/1957
3A Bescot 4w/e 14/06/1958
   Withdrawn w/e 14/10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 8D Widnes w/e 13/08/1949
ALLOC 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 4w/e 30/11/1957
ALLOC 3A Bescot 4w/e 14/06/1958
WDN   w/e 14/10/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/07/1961 Bescot MPD (21B) (Stored) Stored are 42421, 42940, 43963, 47296/363, 49021/77/99/126/275/343/411, 58119/204/283. Also possibly stored 40694 an 58122/3. SLS/196109

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1903 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2574
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4333
   
08/1927 Renumbered Renumbered to 9343    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Longsight (9A)    
06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 49343    
30/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Bescot (3A)    
14/10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 49343    

prev prev