Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 132 Today
» 1257 Yesterday
» 5249 Week
» 25691 Month
» 362537 Year
» 1584102 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 1277 m/e 06/1903
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9149 m/e 11/1927
British Railways 49149 m/e 09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class 4 Cylinder Compound
Company History LNWR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B06/1903
G01/1915
G111/1927
G2A12/1939
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 4348
To Service During 06/1903
Withdrawal w/e Sat 14/11/1959
Service Life 56 yrs, 5 mths , 14 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1903
10A Springs Branch (Wigan) on 01/01/1948
10B Preston 4w/e 21/03/1953
10D Plodder Lane 8w/e 11/07/1953
10C Patricroft 4w/e 09/10/1954
   Withdrawn w/e 14/11/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam w/e 24/04/1948
ALLOC 10B Preston 4w/e 21/03/1953
ALLOC 10D Plodder Lane 4w/e 13/06/1953
ALLOC 10C Patricroft 4w/e 30/10/1954
WDN   w/e 14/11/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1903 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1277
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4348
   
11/1927 Renumbered Renumbered to 9149    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 49149    
21/03/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Preston (10B)    
11/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Plodder Lane (10D)    
09/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Patricroft (10C)    
14/11/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 49149    

prev prev