Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 604 Today
» 1282 Yesterday
» 6994 Week
» 36492 Month
» 373338 Year
» 1594903 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 1287 m/e 09/1903
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 8942 m/e 12/1927
British Railways 48942 m/e 09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class 4 Cylinder Compound
Company History LNWR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B09/1903
G109/1925
G2A06/1940
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 4359
To Service During 09/1903
Withdrawal w/e Sat 07/10/1961
Service Life 58 yrs, 1 mth , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1903
8C Speke Junction on 01/01/1948
8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 15/08/1959
   Withdrawn w/e 07/10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 8w/e 05/09/1959
WDN   w/e 07/10/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1903 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1287
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4359
   
12/1927 Renumbered Renumbered to 8942    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Speke Junction (8C)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 48942    
15/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
07/10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 48942    

prev prev