Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 130 Today
» 1257 Yesterday
» 5247 Week
» 25689 Month
» 362535 Year
» 1584100 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 1288 m/e 09/1903
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 8943 m/e 07/1928
British Railways 48943 m/e 02/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class 4 Cylinder Compound
Company History LNWR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B09/1903
G104/1923
G2A12/1939
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 4360
To Service During 09/1903
Withdrawal Sat 05/09/1959
Service Life 56 yrs , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1903
1A Willesden on 01/01/1948
2A Rugby 5w/e 16/07/1949
3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 4w/e 04/11/1950
5C Stafford 4w/e 14/06/1958
   Withdrawn on 05/09/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 2A Rugby w/e 09/07/1949
ALLOC 8A Edge Hill w/e 19/11/1949
ALLOC 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) w/e 28/10/1950
ALLOC 5C Stafford 4w/e 14/06/1958
WDN   on 05/09/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1903 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1288
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4360
   
07/1928 Renumbered Renumbered to 8943    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Willesden (1A)    
16/07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Rugby (2A)    
02/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 48943    
04/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Stafford (5C)    
05/09/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 48943    

prev prev