Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 423 Today
» 1224 Yesterday
» 4235 Week
» 33733 Month
» 370579 Year
» 1592144 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 1299 m/e 10/1903
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9074 m/e 04/1927
British Railways 49074 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class 4 Cylinder Compound
Company History LNWR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B10/1903
G10/1909
G103/1925
G2A01/1939
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 4371
To Service During 10/1903
Withdrawal Sat 16/12/1950
Service Life 47 yrs, 2 mths , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1903
8D Widnes on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn on 16/12/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 8C Speke Junction w/e 21/02/1948
WDN   on 16/12/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/03/1949 Crewe Works During the past month a further seven Class '5' 4-6-0's-Nos. 44718-24 inclusive-have been put into traffic, painted black with red, cream and grey lining but carrying neither lettering nor crests on the tender sides. No. 46202 recently returned to traffic. The engine was run in on trips from Crewe to Shrewsbury during W/E 19/3, and returned to the regular London-Liverpool working the following week. Since then, however, it is reported to have failed again at Camden, details are not known.
Dynamometer car trials were carried out with Class '4' 2-6-0 No. 43027 on the Crewe-Holyhead line during W/E 9/4; the dynamometer car used was No. 1. Locomotives entering Works during March included:-Nos. 42227/52, 2263/66, 2432/54/80, 2541/44/63, 2611/13/42/50/57/60/73, 44745, 4775, 4819/72/97, 4911/39/63, 44984, 5046/54/88, 45091, 5110/45, 45195, 45229/34, 5244, 45264, 5269/96/7/8, 45326, 5343/82/84, 5408, 5501, 45520, 5556, 45568, 5591, 45597, 5659/70, 45676/90/99, 5703/35, 6004, 46100, 6103/10/13/21, 46134, 6155/56, 46160/63, 6169, 6206/27, 46231, 6235/50/1/2/5, 7972, 47982, 7994/95, 8026/75, 8112/50/57, 8206/70, 8301/2/3/17/24/31/50/61/67, 8495, 8522, 8610/45/91, 48696, 8770, 8906/18, 9042/52/74, 9110/11/66/85, 9210/59/63/89/96/97, 9305/29/40/63/81, 9419/27/29, 28619, 58889 and 2-10-0 73788 (65F).
SLS/194905

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1903 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1299
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4371
   
04/1927 Renumbered Renumbered to 9074    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Widnes (8D)    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 49074    
16/12/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 49074    

prev prev