Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 410 Today
» 1315 Yesterday
» 410 Week
» 29908 Month
» 366754 Year
» 1588319 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 1300 m/e 01/1904
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9379 m/e 03/1927
British Railways 49379 m/e 06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class 4 Cylinder Compound
Company History LNWR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B01/1904
G103/1922
G2A08/1940
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 4386
To Service During 01/1904
Withdrawal w/e Sat 08/10/1949
Service Life 45 yrs, 9 mths , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 01/1904
25G Farnley Junction on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn w/e 08/10/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 3B Bushbury w/e 12/03/1949
ALLOC 3B Bushbury w/e 02/04/1949
WDN   w/e 08/10/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1904 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1300
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4386
   
03/1927 Renumbered Renumbered to 9379    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Farnley Junction (25G)    
06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 49379    
08/10/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 49379    

prev prev