Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 388 Today
» 1315 Yesterday
» 388 Week
» 29886 Month
» 366732 Year
» 1588297 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 641 m/e 02/1904
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9151 m/e 03/1927
British Railways 49151 m/e 02/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class 4 Cylinder Compound
Company History LNWR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B02/1904
G11/1916
G103/1927
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 4391
To Service During 02/1904
Withdrawal w/e Sat 09/08/1952
Service Life 48 yrs, 6 mths , 9 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 02/1904
11A Carnforth on 01/01/1948
9B Stockport Edgeley 4w/e 19/05/1951
   Withdrawn w/e 09/08/1952

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 9B Stockport Edgeley w/e 14/04/1951
WDN   w/e 09/08/1952

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1904 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 641
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4391
   
03/1927 Renumbered Renumbered to 9151    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Carnforth (11A)    
02/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 49151    
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B)    
09/08/1952 Withdrawn Condemned as 49151    

prev prev