Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 402 Today
» 1224 Yesterday
» 4214 Week
» 33712 Month
» 370558 Year
» 1592123 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 509 m/e 05/1904
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9069 m/e 03/1927
British Railways 49069 m/e 08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class 4 Cylinder Compound
Company History LNWR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B05/1904
G11/1908
G111/1933
G2A08/1939
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 4396
To Service During 05/1904
Withdrawal 2w/e Sat 17/06/1950 off Willesden (1A)
Service Life 46 yrs, 1 mth , 18 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1904
2A Rugby on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn 2w/e 17/06/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 2A Rugby w/e 08/03/1947
ALLOC 2C Northampton w/e 28/08/1948
ALLOC 1A Willesden w/e 09/04/1949
WDN   w/e 17/06/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1904 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 509
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4396
   
03/1927 Renumbered Renumbered to 9069    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Rugby (2A)    
08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 49069    
17/06/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 49069 from Willesden (1A)    

prev prev