Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1907 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19710 Week
» 72726 Month
» 192253 Year
» 3219106 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
647 |
m/e |
05/1904 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9615 |
m/e |
06/1927 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1930) |
8899 |
m/e |
07/1930 |
British Railways |
48899 |
m/e |
08/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
4 Cylinder Compound |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
4397 |
To Service |
During 05/1904 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 03/03/1956 |
Service Life |
51 yrs, 10 mths , 2 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
05/1904 |
4D |
|
Abergavenny |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
85C |
|
Hereford |
4w/e |
16/07/1955 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
03/03/1956 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
85C |
Hereford |
4w/e |
16/07/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
29/02/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
03/03/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1904 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 647 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4397 |
|
|
06/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9615 |
|
|
07/1930 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8899 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Abergavenny (4D) |
|
|
08/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48899 |
|
|
16/07/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hereford (85C) |
|
|
03/03/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48899 |
|
|